+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (47)
On April 7, 1998 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 7/5/98
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/6 CHAPTER 8 SLA 98
On March 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- 12:10 PM 3/25/98 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y18 N- E2
On March 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ & HELD TO 3/20
On March 18, 1998 in the House:
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y13 N22 E2 A3
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/18/98
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 159(FIN)
- PASSED Y32 N5 E2 A1
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ROKEBERG
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): SANDERS
On March 2, 1998 in the House:
- KEMPLEN
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): BERKOWITZ, CROFT,
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- SENATE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED) 1/23/98
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED)
- NR: DAVIES, GRUSSENDORF
- DP: THERRIAULT, HANLEY, MOSES, KELLY;
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 4DP 2NR
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): FOSTER
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On January 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 159(L&C)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 1/23/98
- ZERO FNS TO CS (DCED-2)
On January 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR: WILKEN
On January 21, 1998 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): KELLY, TAYLOR
On May 9, 1997 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO RLS COMMITTEE
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/97
On May 8, 1997 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS FN (DCED)
- FISCAL NOTE (DCED)
- NR: SHARP, ADAMS
- DP: PEARCE, PHILLIPS, TORGERSON
- FIN RPT 3DP 2NR (L&C)CS
On May 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- FISCAL NOTE TO SB & CS (DCED)
- DP: LEMAN, MACKIE, MILLER, HOFFMAN
- L&C RPT CS 4DP SAME TITLE
On April 3, 1997 in the Senate:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor