+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 4/24/14
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/23 CHAPTER 13 SLA 14
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- 1:54 PM 4/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS SB 159(L&C)
- PASSED Y35 E3 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS SB 159(L&C)
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 13, 2014 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: CHENAULT, HERRON, SADDLER
- DP: JOSEPHSON, OLSON
- L&C RPT HCS(L&C) 2DP 3NR
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): P.WILSON
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MUNOZ
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 159
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/28/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- COSPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, STEVENS, DYSON, BISHOP
- PASSED Y17 N- E3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SB 159
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- DP: DUNLEAVY, MICCICHE, STEDMAN
- L&C RPT 3DP
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): OLSON, MCGUIRE
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): EGAN
- L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor