+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (57)
On July 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/26/01
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/25 CHAPTER 38 SLA 01
- 3:10 PM 6/20/01 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 8, 2001 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
On May 8, 2001 in the House:
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 158(FIN)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y38 N2
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On May 7, 2001 in the House:
- BERKOWITZ NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y38 N1 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 158(FIN)
On May 6, 2001 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/6/01
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/7 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On May 4, 2001 in the House:
- FN1: (REV)
- MULDER; NR: BUNDE
- MOSES, LANCASTER, HUDSON, FOSTER,
- DP: WHITAKER, HARRIS, CROFT, DAVIES,
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 9DP 1NR
On April 21, 2001 in the House:
- FN1: (REV)
- AM: GREEN
- KAPSNER, MCGUIRE, SCALZI; NR: MASEK;
- DP: KERTTULA, FATE, STEVENS, CHENAULT,
- RES RPT HCS(O&G) 7DP 1NR 1AM
On April 19, 2001 in the House:
- O&G RPT HCS(O&G) 4DP 1AM
- FN1: (REV)
- AM: KOHRING
- DP: DYSON, CHENAULT, GUESS, FATE;
On April 10, 2001 in the House:
- O&G, RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 9, 2001 in the Senate:
- AM NO 1 AS AMENDED ADOPTED Y12 N8
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/01
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 OFFERED
- AM TO AM 1 UNANIMOUS CONSENT
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 158(RES) AM
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 158(RES) AM
On April 6, 2001 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS(RES) 6DP 3NR
- DP: DONLEY, KELLY, AUSTERMAN, OLSON,
- LEMAN, WILKEN; NR: GREEN, HOFFMAN,
- WARD
- FN1: (REV)
On March 29, 2001 in the Senate:
- FN1: (REV)
- KELLY, ELTON; NR: LINCOLN
- DP: TORGERSON, TAYLOR, HALFORD, PEARCE,
- RES RPT CS 6DP 1NR SAME TITLE
On March 23, 2001 in the Senate:
- RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
RESOURCES
Type:
Primary Sponsor