+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On November 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/18 CHAPTER 39 SLA 16
On July 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- 11:00 AM 7/1/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
On April 17, 2016 in the House:
- VERSION: HCS SB 158(L&C) AM H
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
On April 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 16, 2016 in the House:
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/16/2016
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C HCS ADOPTED UC
- PASSED Y36 N3 E1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS SB 158(L&C) AM H
- ENGROSSED
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 33
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 33
- L&C RPT HCS(L&C) NT 2DP 2AM
- AM: JOSEPHSON, TILTON
- DP: KITO, OLSON
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/1/2016
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 158
- PASSED Y17 N3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SB 158
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- DP: COSTELLO, GIESSEL, MEYER
- L&C RPT 3DP
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
LABOR & COMMERCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor