+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (59)
On September 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/20/05
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/19 CHAPTER 80 SLA 05
- 3:44 PM 7/15/05 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 10, 2005 in the House:
- VERSION: SB 158
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- RECEDE FROM (H) AM Y35 N2 A3
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- RECEDE MESSAGE READ
On May 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- HUGGINS (CHAIR), WAGONER, OLSON
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- FAILED CONCUR (H) AM Y2 N17 E1
On May 9, 2005 in the House:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y37 A3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SB 158 AM H
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
On May 8, 2005 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION HELD TO 5/9
On May 7, 2005 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KOHRING
- JOULE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) FAILED Y26 N10 A4
- PASSED Y23 N13 A4
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 158
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/7/2005
On May 4, 2005 in the House:
- FIN RPT 5DP 4NR
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- DP: HAWKER, HOLM, STOLTZE, MEYER, CHENAULT;
- NR: WEYHRAUCH, KELLY, MOSES, JOULE
On May 2, 2005 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: KOTT, LEDOUX, GUTTENBERG
- DP: CRAWFORD, LYNN, ROKEBERG, ANDERSON;
- L&C RPT 4DP 3NR
On April 22, 2005 in the House:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SB 158
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On April 20, 2005 in the Senate:
- PASSED Y17 N3
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 158
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- OLSON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 19, 2005 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/20 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/19/2005
On April 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- DNP: OLSON
- DP: WILKEN, GREEN, DYSON, STEDMAN
- FIN RPT 4DP 1DNP
On April 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: WAGONER, KOOKESH
- DP: STEVENS G, STEDMAN
- CRA RPT 2DP 2NR
On April 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- CRA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor