+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On August 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- 10:25 AM 7/8/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/10 CHAPTER 137 SLA 03
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/8/03
On May 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y17 N- A3
On May 18, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 157(HES) AM H
- PASSED Y36 E4
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: CSSB 157(HES) AM H
On May 17, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/18 CALENDAR
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM
On May 15, 2003 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL WAIVED
On May 8, 2003 in the House:
- HES RPT 5DP
- DP: CISSNA, SEATON, WOLF, GATTO,
- WILSON
- FN1: ZERO(HSS)
On May 1, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HES, FIN
On April 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 157(HES)
- PASSED Y17 N- E1 A2
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 157(HES)
On April 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/29/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- HES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/30 CALENDAR
On April 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS(HES) 5DP 2NR
- DP: GREEN, WILKEN, TAYLOR, BUNDE,
- STEVENS B; NR: HOFFMAN, OLSON
- FN1: ZERO(HSS)
On April 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- HES RPT CS 3DP 2NR SAME TITLE
- DP: DYSON, GREEN, WILKEN;
- NR: GUESS, DAVIS
- FN1: ZERO(HSS)
On March 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HES, FIN