+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/18 CHAPTER 36 SLA 98
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 8/16/98
On May 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- 10:30 AM 5/5/98 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 28, 1998 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/28/98
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 157(FIN)
- PASSED Y33 N4 E1 A2
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HUDSON, BRICE
On March 27, 1998 in the House:
- FIN RPT 3DP 1DNP 3NR 1AM
- DP: DAVIES, GRUSSENDORF, MOSES;
- DNP: DAVIS; NR: THERRIAULT, MARTIN,
- KELLY; AM: KOHRING
- SENATE FISCAL NOTE (ADM) 1/23/98
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- TRA RPT 4DP 2NR
- DP: ELTON, KOOKESH, COWDERY, WILLIAMS;
- NR: SANDERS, MASEK
- SENATE FISCAL NOTE (ADM) 1/23/98
On January 30, 1998 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- TRANSPORTATION, FINANCE
On January 28, 1998 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 1/28/98
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 157(FIN)
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On January 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE
- DP:SHARP, DONLEY, TORGERSON; NR:PHILLIPS
- FISCAL NOTE TO CS (ADM)
On May 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- TRA RPT 1DP 4NR
- DP:WARD;NR:HALFORD,LINCOLN,GREEN,WILKEN
- FISCAL NOTE (ADM)
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- TRA, FIN
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor