+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (60)
On November 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- 9:35 AM 7/20/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/24 CHAPTER 67 SLA 18
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On June 27, 2018 in the House:
- FN2: (CED)
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 286
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18
On June 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- E1
- CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP UC
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 155(L&C) AM H
- RET 2ND/RESCIND ACTION AM 1 UC
- RESCIND ACTION (ADP) AM 1 Y38 E2
- AM NO 2 OFFERED
- AM 1 TO AM 2 ADOPTED UC
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- AM NO 2 AS AM ADOPTED Y23 N15 E2
- PASSED Y32 N6 E2
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 155(L&C) AM H
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 30, 2018 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/1 CALENDAR
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y21 N17 E2
- L&C HCS ADOPTED UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/30/2018
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- DP: GARA, THOMPSON, SEATON, FOSTER
- FIN RPT HCS(L&C) 4DP 2DNP 4NR
- NR: WILSON, TILTON, PRUITT, ORTIZ
- DNP: KAWASAKI, GUTTENBERG
- FN2: (CED)
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- FN2: (CED)
- NR: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, WOOL, KNOPP, KITO
- DNP: STUTES
- DP: JOSEPHSON, BIRCH
- L&C RPT HCS(L&C) 2DP 1DNP 4NR
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/23/2018
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 155(FIN)
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 155(FIN)
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- FN2: (CED)
- DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, MICCICHE
- FIN RPT CS 6DP NEW TITLE
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- FN1: (CED)
- NR: STEVENS, GARDNER
- DP: MEYER
- AM: COSTELLO, MICCICHE
- L&C RPT 1DP 2NR 2AM
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor