+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (57)
On August 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- 10:55AM 6/16/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/18 CHAPTER 124 SLA 03
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/19/03
On May 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y14 N6
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 20, 2003 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 155(RLS)
On May 19, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 155(RLS)
- PASSED Y26 N10 E3 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y28 N8 E3 A1
- KERTTULA NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 18, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/18/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RLS HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/19
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): STOLTZE, LYNN
On May 17, 2003 in the House:
- RLS RPT HCS(RLS) 5DP 2DNP
- DP: MCGUIRE, COGHILL, KOTT, MORGAN,
- ROKEBERG; DNP: BERKOWITZ, KERTTULA
- FN2: ZERO(DFG)
On May 15, 2003 in the House:
- CRA RPT 3DP 1NR
- DP: KOTT, ANDERSON, MORGAN; NR: SAMUELS
- FN2: ZERO(DFG)
On May 13, 2003 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WOLF
On May 10, 2003 in the House:
- RES RPT 6DP 3AM
- DP: MASEK, GATTO, MORGAN, WOLF, LYNN,
- FATE; AM: GUTTENBERG, CISSNA, HEINZE
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
On May 8, 2003 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MORGAN
On May 5, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES, CRA
On May 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 155(RES)
On May 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 155(RES)
- COSPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, WILKEN, TAYLOR
- PASSED Y14 N1 E5
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- ELTON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/2/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/3 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): LINCOLN, OGAN, COWDERY,
- GREEN, DYSON, WAGONER, STEVENS B,
- THERRIAULT
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- RES RPT CS 5DP 1DNP NEW TITLE
- DP: WAGONER, DYSON, LINCOLN, STEVENS B,
- SEEKINS; DNP: ELTON
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
On April 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT CS 2DP 2DNP 1NR NEW TITLE
- DP: SEEKINS, THERRIAULT;
- DNP: FRENCH, ELLIS; NR: OGAN
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
On March 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD, RES
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor