+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- FN2: (EED)
- DP: DAVIS, FRENCH, STEVENS G
- DNP: BUNDE, SEEKINS;
- L&C RPT 3DP 2DNP
On April 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN1: (EED)
- DP: DYSON; NR: WILKEN, GREEN
- HES RPT 1DP 2NR
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- TAYLOR, LINCOLN, ELTON
- COSPONSOR(S): WAGONER, STEVENS G,
On March 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): DAVIS, ELLIS
- HES, L&C, FIN
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED-REFERRALS
On March 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- HES, L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS