+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (61)
On September 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/14/05
- 4:14 PM 7/6/05 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/13 CHAPTER 70 SLA 05
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On May 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- E1
On May 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
On May 8, 2005 in the House:
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 154(JUD)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y39 E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 154(JUD)
On May 7, 2005 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/7/2005
- JUD HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/8 CALENDAR
On May 6, 2005 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): CHENAULT, HOLM, STOLTZE, CROFT
- FN5: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN3: ZERO(HSS)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- DP: HAWKER, CROFT, STOLTZE, MOSES, HOLM, WEYHRAUCH, FOSTER, CHENAULT
- FIN RPT HCS(JUD) 8DP
On May 4, 2005 in the House:
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- JUD RPT HCS(JUD) 5DP 1NR
- DP: GRUENBERG, ANDERSON, DAHLSTROM, COGHILL, MCGUIRE;
- NR: GARA
- FN3: ZERO(HSS)
- FN5: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HAWKER
- FN4: ZERO(S.JUD)
On April 22, 2005 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KELLY
On April 21, 2005 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): RAMRAS
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 20, 2005 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 154(JUD)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/20/2005
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 154(JUD)
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- NR: FRENCH, GUESS
- JUD RPT CS 3DP 2NR SAME TITLE
- DP: SEEKINS, THERRIAULT, HUGGINS
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FN3: ZERO(HSS)
- FN4: ZERO(S.JUD)
On April 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- FN3: ZERO(HSS)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- NR: WAGONER
- DP: THERRIAULT, DAVIS
- STA RPT CS 2DP 1NR SAME TITLE
On March 29, 2005 in the Senate:
- STA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor