+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On November 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2:34 PM 9/7/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 9/11 CHAPTER 105 SLA 18
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 12/10/18
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2018
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- MLV HCS ADOPTED Y34 N1 A5
- AM NO 1 OFFERED
- AM NO 1 TABLED Y21 N16 A3
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS SB 152(MLV)
- PASSED Y40
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 27
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, KAWASAKI, KOPP, CHENAULT
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS SB 152(MLV)
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GARA
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- MLV RPT HCS(MLV) NT 6DP 1NR
- PENDING TITLE CHANGE HCR
- DP: RAUSCHER, SPOHNHOLZ, SADDLER, PARISH, LEDOUX, TUCK
- NR: REINBOLD
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): SULLIVAN-LEONARD
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- MLV
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MILLETT, TILTON, GRENN, TUCK
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/7/2018
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 152
- COSPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, COGHILL, HUGHES, BISHOP, STEDMAN, COSTELLO, GIESSEL
- MACKINNON, HOFFMAN, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, KELLY
- PASSED Y19 N- V1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SB 152
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 3DP 1NR
- DP: MEYER, WILSON, GIESSEL
- NR: EGAN
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
+ − Amendment
AM 1
AM NO 1 TABLED Y21 N16 A3
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor