+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On August 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- 11:50 AM 6/9/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/11 CHAPTER 60 SLA 03
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/12/03
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSSB 151(L&C)
On May 13, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 151(L&C)
- PASSED Y32 E4 A4
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- GARA NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN
On May 12, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/12/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/13 CALENDAR
On May 7, 2003 in the House:
- RES RPT 7DP
- DP: LYNN, GATTO, HEINZE, MORGAN,
- GUTTENBERG, KERTTULA, FATE
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(DNR)
- FN2: ZERO(CED)
On April 29, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES
On April 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 151(L&C)
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 151(L&C)
On April 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/25/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/28 CALENDAR
On April 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- RES RPT CS(L&C) 4DP 3NR
- NR: OGAN, ELTON, LINCOLN;
- DP: SEEKINS, STEVENS B, WAGONER, DYSON
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(DNR)
- FN2: ZERO(CED)
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT CS 5DP NEW TITLE
- DP: BUNDE, DAVIS, FRENCH,
- SEEKINS, STEVENS G
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(DNR) CORRECTED
- FN2: ZERO(CED)
On March 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, RES
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor