+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On May 2, 1995 in the House:
- JUDICIARY, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On May 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y11 N8 E1
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On April 30, 1995 in the Senate:
- HALFORD NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- FAILED PASSAGE Y9 N9 E2
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 151
On April 29, 1995 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/29/95
- ADVANCE TO THIRD READING FLD Y12 N6 E2
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- THIRD READING 4/30 CALENDAR
On April 18, 1995 in the Senate:
- ZERO FN REPLACES #1 (ADM)
On April 12, 1995 in the Senate:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (ADM)
- FISCAL NOTE (COURT)
- FIN RPT 2DP 2DNP 3NR
On April 5, 1995 in the Senate:
- FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsor
FINANCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor