+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): PETERSEN, P.WILSON
- MLV, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- REFERRED TO MILITARY & VETERANS' AFFAIRS
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- L&C RPT CS (STA) 5DP
- DP: EGAN, GIESSEL, DAVIS, PASKVAN, MENARD
- FN1: ZERO(LWF)
- FN2: ZERO(UA)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/1/2012
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FN3: ZERO(CED)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- COSPONSOR(S): DAVIS, PASKVAN, EGAN, MCGUIRE, STEDMAN, THOMAS, KOOKESH, DYSON,
- FRENCH, STEVENS
- PASSED Y19 N1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 150(STA)
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 150(STA)
On January 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- DP: WIELECHOWSKI, PASKVAN, MEYER
- STA RPT CS 3DP 1NR NEW TITLE
- FN2: ZERO(UA)
- NR: GIESSEL
- FN1: ZERO(LWF)
- FISCAL INFO FORTHCOMING
On January 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): ELLIS, MEYER, MENARD
On January 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- STA, L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/13/12
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor