+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (71)
On November 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- 11:17 AM 7/10/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/13 CHAPTER 57 SLA 18
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On June 27, 2018 in the House:
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 286
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18
On June 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18
On June 27, 2018 in the House:
- FN7: (CED)
On May 12, 2018 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RULES TO 2ND SUP CALENDAR 5/12/2018
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING Y37 N1 A2
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 15(L&C)
- PASSED Y37 N3
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ, ZULKOSKY, SADDLER, JOSEPHSON, KAWASAKI, TUCK
On May 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- E1
On May 12, 2018 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
On May 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 12, 2018 in the House:
- L&C HCS ADOPTED UC
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 15(L&C)
On May 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KOPP
On April 20, 2018 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GARA
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- AM: WILSON, TILTON
- FIN RPT HCS(L&C) NT 6DP 2AM
- TECHNICAL TITLE CHANGE
- DP: GARA, PRUITT, THOMPSON, GUTTENBERG, GRENN, SEATON
- FN6: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
- FN7: (CED)
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- FN7: (CED)
- FN6: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
- NR: STUTES, WOOL, BIRCH
- DP: KITO
- TECHNICAL TITLE CHANGE
- L&C RPT HCS(L&C) NT 1DP 3NR
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GRENN
- L&C, FIN
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 15(FIN)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/8/2018
- VERSION: CSSB 15(FIN)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, MICCICHE
- FIN RPT CS 6DP 1NR NEW TITLE
- FN6: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
- NR: OLSON
- FN7: (CED)
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- WIELECHOWSKI, WILSON, KELLY, BISHOP
- COSPONSOR(S): GIESSEL, COSTELLO, MACKINNON, VON IMHOF, MICCICHE, HUGHES, MEYER
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- AM: MEYER
- JUD RPT CS 3DP 1NR 1AM NEW TITLE
- NR: COGHILL
- DP: WIELECHOWSKI, KELLY, COSTELLO
- FN5:(CED)
- FN2: ZERO(DHS)
- FN3: ZERO(LAW)
- FN4: ZERO(DPS)
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- FN4: ZERO(DPS)
- FN3: ZERO(LAW)
- FN2: ZERO(DHS)
- FN1: (CED)
- DP: COSTELLO, HUGHES, MEYER, GARDNER
- L&C RPT CS 4DP NEW TITLE
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- L&C, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/13/17
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor