+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On August 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- 10:03AM 8/5/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 8/8 CHAPTER 153 SLA 03
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/6/03
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSSB 149(RES)
On May 20, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 149(RES)
- MOTION TO RET TO 2ND FOR AM 1 WITHDRAWN
- PASSED Y27 N10 E2 A1
- GARA NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN
On May 19, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/19/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/20 CALENDAR
On May 18, 2003 in the House:
- FIN RPT 5DP 2DNP
- DP: MEYER, HAWKER, STOLTZE, WHITAKER,
- HARRIS; DNP: KERTTULA, BERKOWITZ
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- RES RPT 2DP 2DNP 2NR 1AM
- DP: HEINZE, FATE; DNP: GUTTENBERG,
- CISSNA; NR: MORGAN, WOLF; AM: GATTO
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
On May 15, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES, FIN
On May 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 149(RES)
On May 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION HELD TO 5/14/03
On May 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 149(RES)
- PASSED Y12 N8
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/11/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/12 CALENDAR
On May 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- FIN REFERRAL WAIVED
On May 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- RES RPT CS 5DP 1DNP 1AM NEW TITLE
- DP: OGAN, SEEKINS, STEVENS B, WAGONER,
- DYSON; DNP: ELTON; AM: LINCOLN
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
On March 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): STEVENS B
On March 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES, FIN
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor