+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (47)
On August 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- 11:50 AM 6/9/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/11 CHAPTER 69 SLA 03
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
On May 19, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/19/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 148
- PASSED Y33 E2 A5
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- DAHLSTROM NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y33 E4 A3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: SB 148
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM
On May 17, 2003 in the House:
- FIN RPT 5DP 4NR
- DP: MEYER, HAWKER, BERKOWITZ, FOSTER,
- WILLIAMS; NR: STOLTZE, KERTTULA,
- MOSES, WHITAKER
- FN1: (REV)
On May 13, 2003 in the House:
- MLV RPT 6DP
- DP: FATE, GRUENBERG, DAHLSTROM, CISSNA,
- MASEK, LYNN
- FN1: (REV)
On May 7, 2003 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN
On May 6, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- MLV, FIN
On May 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SB 148
On May 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 148
- PASSED Y14 N- E5 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- ELTON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/3/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/4 CALENDAR
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 2DP 5NR
- NR: GREEN, WILKEN, HOFFMAN, OLSON,
- BUNDE; DP: STEVENS B, TAYLOR
- FN1: (REV)
On April 9, 2003 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 4DP
- DP: STEVENS G, COWDERY, DYSON, GUESS
- FN1: (REV)
On March 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, FIN
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor