+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/23/14
- SIGNED INTO LAW 3/25 CHAPTER 3 SLA 14
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- 12:50 PM 3/20 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): OLSON, CHENAULT
- VERSION: SB 148
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y35 E5
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 148
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/26/2014
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
- NR: GRUENBERG, HERRON
- DP: OLSON, HAWKER, KELLER, CHENAULT, JOHNSON
- RLS RPT 5DP 2NR
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RLS
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SB 148
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- COSPONSOR(S): STEVENS
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 148
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/10/2014
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(DFG)
- NR: FRENCH
- DP: GIESSEL, MICCICHE, BISHOP, DYSON, FAIRCLOUGH, MCGUIRE
- RES RPT 6DP 1NR
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- RES WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS