+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On August 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/28 CHAPTER 132 SLA03
- 2:33 PM 6/25/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 18, 2003 in the House:
- VERSION: SB 147
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y36 E4
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 147
On May 17, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/18 CALENDAR
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL WAIVED
On May 10, 2003 in the House:
- FN1: (DFG)
- WOLF, FATE; NR: CISSNA
- DP: LYNN, GATTO, MORGAN, HEINZE, MASEK,
- RES RPT 7DP 1NR
On May 2, 2003 in the House:
- RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SB 147
On April 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y18 N- E1 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 147
On April 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/30 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/29/2003
On April 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- STEVENS B; NR: HOFFMAN, OLSON
- FIN RPT 5DP 2NR
- DP: GREEN, WILKEN, TAYLOR, BUNDE;
- COSPONSOR(S): WILKEN, TAYLOR, SEEKINS,
- FN1: (DFG)
- WAGONER, DYSON, BUNDE, COWDERY, OGAN,
- OLSON, STEVENS B
On April 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN1: (DFG)
- DYSON; NR: LINCOLN, ELTON
- DP: OGAN, SEEKINS, STEVENS B, WAGONER,
- RES RPT 5DP 2NR
On March 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor