+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (49)
On August 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/03
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/11 CHAPTER 68 SLA 03
- 11:50 AM 6/9/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 20, 2003 in the House:
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MASEK, GARA, CHENAULT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- LYNN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 146
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y34 E4 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: SB 146
- PASSED Y33 E5 A2
On May 19, 2003 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ANDERSON
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/20 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/19/2003
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- FN1: (ADM)
- WEYHRAUCH
- DP: SEATON, GRUENBERG, HOLM, CRAWFORD,
- STA RPT 5DP
On May 13, 2003 in the House:
- DP: CISSNA, GRUENBERG, FATE, MASEK,
- MLV RPT 6DP
- FN1: (ADM)
- DAHLSTROM, LYNN
On May 5, 2003 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN, MCGUIRE
- MLV, STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- FRENCH, LINCOLN, WAGONER, SEEKINS,
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/2/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- COSPONSOR(S): WILKEN, DYSON, STEVENS G,
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 146
- ELTON, TAYLOR, COWDERY, OLSON,
- THERRIAULT
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SB 146
On April 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN1: (ADM)
- NR: GREEN, BUNDE
- DP: WILKEN, TAYLOR, OLSON;
- FIN RPT 3DP 2NR
On April 9, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN1: (ADM)
- DP: STEVENS G, COWDERY, DYSON, GUESS
- STA RPT 4DP
On March 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor