+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/20/05
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/19 CHAPTER 25 SLA 05
On May 19, 2005 in the Senate:
- 11:15 AM 5/18/05 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 7, 2005 in the House:
- VERSION: CSSB 143(STA)
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y39 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 143(STA)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/7/2005
On April 26, 2005 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- DP: KOTT, ANDERSON, DAHLSTROM, GARA, MCGUIRE
- JUD RPT 5DP
On April 4, 2005 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD
On April 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSSB 143(STA)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 143(STA)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/1/2005
On March 30, 2005 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- NR: DAVIS
- DP: THERRIAULT, WAGONER, HUGGINS
- STA RPT CS 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE
On March 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
STATE AFFAIRS
Type:
Primary Sponsor