+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (42)
On November 1, 2016 in the House:
- TECHNICAL TITLE CHANGE
On July 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2:13 PM 6/20/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 1/1/17
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/6 CHAPTER 34 SLA 16
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- A1
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 142(L&C)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KITO, GATTIS, HERRON, LYNN, TARR, JOSEPHSON, SADDLER,
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y36 N1 E1 A2
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 142(L&C)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- L&C HCS ADOPTED UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2016
- SPOHNHOLZ
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- TECHNICAL TITLE CHANGE
- L&C RPT HCS(L&C) NT 4DP
- DP: JOSEPHSON, KITO, TILTON, OLSON
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): STUTES, COLVER, TILTON, LEDOUX
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/2/2016
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C CS ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 142(L&C) AM
- COSPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, COSTELLO, COGHILL, MICCICHE, BISHOP, EGAN
- MACKINNON, GARDNER, KELLY
- PASSED Y16 N- E3 A1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 142(L&C) AM
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- DP: COSTELLO, GIESSEL, MEYER, STEVENS
- L&C RPT CS 4DP SAME TITLE
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): ELLIS
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor