+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (74)
On January 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- 1/14/98 CHAPTER 1, SLA 98
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 4/14/98
On January 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- GOVERNOR VETO OVERRIDDEN Y45 N13 E2
- 2:20 PM 1/14/98 RETURNED TO GOVERNOR
On July 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- 8:25 AM 6/2/97 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- VETOED BY GOVERNOR 6/20/97
On May 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y14 N5 E1
On May 10, 1997 in the House:
- READ THE 3RD TIME HCS CSSB 141(FIN) AM H
- PASSED Y29 N7 A4
- JAMES NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y31 N8 A1
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
On May 9, 1997 in the House:
- AM NO 1, 4 & 5 WERE OFFERED LATER
- AM NO 2 & 3 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 6 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 7 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 8 FAILED Y10 N24 A6
- AM NO 9 FAILED Y14 N20 A6
- AM NO 10 OFFERED
- AM TO AM 10 FAILED Y17 N20 A3
- AM NO 10 FAILED Y3 N34 A3
- AM NO 11 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y11 N24 A5
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y13 N23 A4
- AM NO 5 FAILED Y3 N33 A4
- AM NO 12 FAILED Y12 N24 A4
- RESCIND ACTION FLG AM 4/FLD Y14 N23 A3
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/10 CALENDAR
On May 8, 1997 in the House:
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 4DP 4NR 1AM
- DP: MULDER, MARTIN, KOHRING, FOSTER
- NR: THERRIAULT, HANLEY, GRUSSENDORF,
- DAVIS; AM: DAVIES
- SENATE FISCAL NOTE (DPS) 4/3/97
- 2 SENATE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DPS) 3/26/97
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/08/97
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- HELD IN SECOND READING TO 5/9 CALENDAR
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KOHRING, OGAN
On May 5, 1997 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- FINANCE
On May 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 141(RLS)
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 4 CORRECTED
- AM NO 4 ADOPTED Y15 N- E1 A4
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- FAILED PASSAGE Y10 N5 E1 A4
- HALFORD NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY Y15 N5 E1
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y13 N6 E1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On May 1, 1997 in the Senate:
- RLS TO CAL W/CS & 1DNP 5/1/97
- PREVIOUS FN APPLIES (DPS)
- PREVIOUS ZERO FNS (DPS-2)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RLS CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y6 N13 E1
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y7 N12 E1
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y8 N11 E1
- ADVANCE TO 3RD FAILED Y14 N5 E1
- THIRD READING 5/2 CALENDAR
On April 25, 1997 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS 1DP 5NR 1DNP SAME TITLE
- DP: SHARP; NR: PEARCE, PARNELL, DONLEY,
- TORGERSON, PHILLIPS; DNP: ADAMS
- PREVIOUS FN (DPS)
- PREVIOUS ZERO FNS (DPS-2)
On April 3, 1997 in the Senate:
- FISCAL NOTE TO CS (DPS)
On March 26, 1997 in the Senate:
- STA RPT CS 3DP 1DNP SAME TITLE
- DP: GREEN, MILLER, WARD; DNP: DUNCAN
- FISCAL NOTES TO SB (DPS, GOV)
- ZERO FISCAL NOTES TO SB (DPS-2)
On March 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- STA, FIN
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor