+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- AM NO 5 BEFORE THE BODY
- BILL TABLED Y11 N8 E1
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- TAKEN FROM THE TABLE Y12 N8
- CONSIDERATION POSTPONED TO 5/17/22 AT 9:00 A.M.
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AMDS Y16 N1 E3
- AM NO 3 ADOPTED Y9 N8 E3
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y7 N10 E3
- AM NO 5 OFFERED
- BILL TABLED WITH AM NO 5 PENDING UC
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- BEFORE THE SENATE IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AMDS UC
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y10 N10
- MOTION TO LIMIT DEBATE TO TWO MINUTES WITHDRAWN
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y7 N12 E1
- CONSIDERATION NOT COMPLETE - ON 5/11 CALENDAR
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR UC
- NOT TAKEN UP 5/9 - ON 5/10 CALENDAR
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 140(JUD)
- HELD IN THIRD READING TO 5/9 CAL
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/4/2022
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/5 CAL
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT CS 2DP 1DNP 1NR SAME TITLE
- DP: HOLLAND, HUGHES
- DNP: KIEHL
- NR: MYERS
- FN1: ZERO(EED)
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- JUD WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- JUD REFERRAL ADDED AFTER EDC
On April 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- EDC RPT CS 4DP SAME TITLE
- DP: HOLLAND, HUGHES, STEVENS, MICCICHE
- FN1: ZERO(EED)
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): REINBOLD, SHOWER
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- EDC
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor