+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (100)
On June 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- 4:12 PM 6/6/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/18 CHAPTER 31 SLA 18
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/19/18
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP UC
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y18 N1 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- BEFORE HOUSE IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC
- AM NO 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y32 N8
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- BIRCH NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y31 N6 E1 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 14(RLS)
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2018
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RLS HCS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 14(RLS)
- HELD IN THIRD READING TO 4/13 CALENDAR
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): SULLIVAN-LEONARD, BIRCH, PARISH
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- RLS RPT HCS(RLS) 1DP 2DNP 4NR
- DP: LEDOUX
- DNP: KITO, EASTMAN
- NR: CHENAULT, CLAMAN, STUTES, REINBOLD
- FN6: ZERO(H.RLS/COMBINED)
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- RLS WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23(A) UC
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- 1ST CROSS SPONSOR: WOOL
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): SADDLER
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- L&C RPT HCS(L&C) 4DP 2AM
- DP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, WOOL, BIRCH, KITO
- AM: JOSEPHSON, KNOPP
- FN1: ZERO(LWF)
- FN2: ZERO(LWF)
- FN4: ZERO(CED)
- FN5: ZERO(ADM)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MILLETT
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): PRUITT
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 14(FIN)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMENDMENTS UC
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y4 N15 E1
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y5 N14 E1
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y4 N15 E1
- AM TO AM 4 ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 4 AS AMENDED ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 5 FAILED Y8 N11 E1
- AM TO AM 6 ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 6 AS AMENDED ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 7 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 8 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 9 FAILED Y4 N15 E1
- AM NO 10 FAILED Y8 N11 E1
- AM NO 11 FAILED Y4 N15 E1
- AM NO 12 FAILED Y4 N15 E1
- AM NO 13 FAILED Y4 N15 E1
- AM NO 14 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 15 FAILED Y6 N13 E1
- AM NO 16 FAILED Y4 N15 E1
- AM NO 17 FAILED Y5 N14 E1
- AM NO 18 FAILED Y4 N15 E1
- AM NO 19 FAILED Y5 N14 E1
- AM NO 20 FAILED Y5 N14 E1
- AM NO 21 FAILED Y4 N15 E1
- AM NO 22 FAILED Y4 N15 E1
- AM NO 23 FAILED Y4 N15 E1
- AM NO 24 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y14 N5 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 14(FIN) AM
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/22/2017
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/23 CALENDAR
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS 1DP 6NR NEW TITLE
- DP: MACKINNON
- NR: HOFFMAN, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, DUNLEAVY, OLSON, MICCICHE
- FN1: ZERO(LWF)
- FN2: ZERO(LWF)
- FN4: ZERO(CED)
- FN5: ZERO(ADM)
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT CS 2DP 3NR SAME TITLE
- DP: COSTELLO, HUGHES
- NR: MEYER, STEVENS, GARDNER
- FN1: ZERO(LWF)
- FN2: ZERO(LWF)
- FN3: ZERO(ADM)
- FN4: ZERO(CED)
- COSPONSOR(S): HUGHES, MEYER
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/17
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, FIN
+ − Amendments (25)
AM 14
AM NO 14 NOT OFFERED
AM 7
AM NO 7 NOT OFFERED
AM 8
AM NO 8 NOT OFFERED
AM 24
AM NO 24 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
AM 13
AM NO 13 FAILED Y4 N15 E1
AM 15
AM NO 15 FAILED Y6 N13 E1
AM 16
AM NO 16 FAILED Y4 N15 E1
AM 17
AM NO 17 FAILED Y5 N14 E1
AM 18
AM NO 18 FAILED Y4 N15 E1
AM 19
AM NO 19 FAILED Y5 N14 E1
AM 1 to AM 6
AM NO 6 AS AMENDED ADOPTED UC
AM 20
AM NO 20 FAILED Y5 N14 E1
AM 21
AM NO 21 FAILED Y4 N15 E1
AM 22
AM NO 22 FAILED Y4 N15 E1
AM 23
AM NO 23 FAILED Y4 N15 E1
AM 9
AM NO 9 FAILED Y4 N15 E1
AM 10
AM NO 10 FAILED Y8 N11 E1
AM 11
AM NO 11 FAILED Y4 N15 E1
AM 12
AM NO 12 FAILED Y4 N15 E1
AM 3
AM NO 3 FAILED Y4 N15 E1
AM 4
AM NO 4 AS AMENDED ADOPTED UC
AM 5
AM NO 5 OFFERED
AM 1 to AM 4
AM TO AM 4 ADOPTED UC
AM 2
AM NO 2 OFFERED
AM 1
AM NO 1 OFFERED
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor