+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (53)
On January 11, 1996 in the Senate:
- GOVERNOR VETO SUSTAINED Y37 N23
On June 26, 1995 in the Senate:
- VETOED BY GOVERNOR 5/19/95
On April 28, 1995 in the Senate:
- 3:40 PM 4/28/95 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR
On April 26, 1995 in the House:
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y35 N3 E1 A1
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On April 25, 1995 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/25/95
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 14(JUD)
- PASSED Y35 E1 A4
- DAVIES NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 22, 1995 in the House:
- 2 SENATE ZERO FNS (DPS, CORR) 3/6/95
- 3 SENATE FNS (COURT, DPS, LAW) 3/6/95
- SENATE FISCAL NOTE (ADM) 3/15/95
- NR: BROWN
- DP: KOHRING, KELLY, THERRIAULT
- DP: FOSTER, HANLEY, MULDER, MARTIN
- FIN RPT 7DP 1NR
On April 5, 1995 in the House:
- NR: VEZEY, BUNDE
- DP: PORTER, FINKELSTEIN, TOOHEY
- JUD RPT 3DP 2NR
- 3 SENATE FNS (COURT, LAW, DPS) 3/6/95
- 2 SENATE ZERO FNS (CORR, DPS) 3/6/95
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): BUNDE
- SENATE FISCAL NOTE (ADM) 3/15/95
On March 24, 1995 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TOOHEY
On March 22, 1995 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): FINKELSTEIN
- JUDICIARY, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On March 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S) PEARCE, TAYLOR,
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/20/95
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- KELLY, GREEN
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 14(JUD)
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
On March 15, 1995 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS ZERO FNS (DPS, CORR)
- PREVIOUS FNS (COURT, DPS, LAW)
- FN TO JUD SCS (ADM)
- FIN RPT 4DP 3NR (JUD)CS
On March 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- FISCAL NOTES TO SB (COURT, CORR)
- JUD RPT CS 1DP 3NR SAME TITLE
- ZERO FNS TO CS (DPS, CORR)
- ZERO FNS TO SB (DPS-2, LAW)
- FNS TO CS (COURT, DPS, LAW)
On February 3, 1995 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR: MILLER
On January 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On January 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/6/95
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor