+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On August 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/28 CHAPTER 32 SLA 03
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/29/03
On May 9, 2003 in the Senate:
- 4:30 PM 5/8/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 5, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/5/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 139
- PASSED Y37 E3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: SB 139
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): OGG, LYNN
On May 2, 2003 in the House:
- FIN RPT 9DP 1NR
- DP: MEYER, HAWKER, CROFT, MOSES,
- CHENAULT, WHITAKER, FOSTER, HARRIS,
- WILLIAMS; NR: STOLTZE
- FN2: (REV)
On April 15, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On April 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 139
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SB 139
On April 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- FIN REFERRAL WAIVED
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- RES RPT 5DP 1NR
- DP: OGAN, SEEKINS, STEVENS B,
- WAGONER, ELTON; NR: LINCOLN
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
On March 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES, FIN
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor