+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (40)
On September 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- 10:30 AM 6/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/17 CHAPTER 25 SLA 14
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/18/14
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 137
- PASSED Y38 E2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: SB 137
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, HUGHES
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- FIN RPT 7DP 1NR
- DP: GUTTENBERG, MUNOZ, THOMPSON, EDGMON, HOLMES, STOLTZE, AUSTERMAN
- NR: NEUMAN
- FN1: (DNR)
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- RES RPT 6DP 3NR
- DP: SEATON, JOHNSON, P.WILSON, TARR, FEIGE, SADDLER
- NR: KAWASAKI, HAWKER, OLSON
- FN1: (DNR)
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES, FIN
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/24/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 137
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SB 137
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 4DP 2NR
- DP: KELLY, MEYER, FAIRCLOUGH, HOFFMAN
- NR: DUNLEAVY, OLSON
- FN1: (DNR)
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- RES RPT 4DP
- DP: GIESSEL, FRENCH, MICCICHE, DYSON
- FN1: (DNR)
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES