+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (44)
On May 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 4/21/20
- 2:15 P.M. 4/7/20 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/20 CHAPTER 19 SLA 20
On March 21, 2020 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN RPT 10DP
- JOHNSTON, FOSTER
- FN1: (COR)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/21/2020
- DP: ORTIZ, CARPENTER, TILTON, LEBON, KNOPP, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD,
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 137
- PASSED Y33 E6 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- VERSION: SB 137
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
On March 20, 2020 in the House:
- IN FINANCE
- RULES TO CALENDAR PENDING RPT/REF
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- IN FINANCE
- RULES TO CALENDAR PENDING RPT/REF
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/18/2020
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 137
- PASSED Y16 N- E4
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- MOTION TO WAIVE FIN PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23(A) W/ SB 120
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SB 137
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
- MOTION TO DIVIDE QUESTION (FLD) Y17 N20 E2 A1
- FIN WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23(A) (PSD) Y23 N15 E2
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TUCK
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 5DP
- DP: STEDMAN, VON IMHOF, WILSON, WIELECHOWSKI, BISHOP
- FN1: (COR)
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- FN1: (COR)
- NR: WILSON
- DP: REVAK, COGHILL
- STA RPT 2DP 1NR
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/10/20
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor