+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 9, 1997 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 5/9/97
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/8 CHAPTER 23 SLA 97
On April 25, 1997 in the Senate:
- 4:00 PM 4/25/97 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 23, 1997 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
On April 22, 1997 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ROKEBERG, JAMES
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y37 E2 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS SB 137(L&C)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- L&C HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/22/97
On April 14, 1997 in the House:
- L&C RPT HCS(L&C) 4DP 2NR
- DP: SANDERS, RYAN, HUDSON, ROKEBERG
- NR: COWDERY, BRICE
- 2 SENATE ZERO FNS (LABOR, DPS) 3/26/97
On April 3, 1997 in the House:
- LABOR & COMMERCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/2/97
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 137
- COSPONSOR(S): TAYLOR, PEARCE, MACKIE
- PASSED Y18 N- A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On March 26, 1997 in the Senate:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTES (LABOR, DPS)
- DP: LEMAN, KELLY MILLER; NR: HOFFMAN
- L&C RPT 3DP 1NR
On March 12, 1997 in the Senate:
- L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)