+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (39)
On September 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/19/14
- 10:30 AM 6/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/18 CHAPTER 28 SLA 14
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 135
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y38 E2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: SB 135
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HUGHES
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- FN1: (DHS)
- STOLTZE, AUSTERMAN
- DP: GUTTENBERG, MUNOZ, NEUMAN, THOMPSON, EDGMON, T.WILSON, HOLMES, COSTELLO,
- FIN RPT 10DP
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SB 135
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- FRENCH NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 135
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/4/2014
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 6DP 1NR
- NR: FAIRCLOUGH
- DP: KELLY, MEYER, HOFFMAN, BISHOP, DUNLEAVY, OLSON
- FN1: (DHS)
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER HSS
- FN1: (DHS)
- NR: MICCICHE
- DP: STEDMAN, KELLY, MEYER
- HSS RPT 3DP 1NR
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- HSS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor