+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (50)
On May 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 4/3/20
On May 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/20 CHAPTER 18 SLA 20
- 2:15 P.M. 4/7/20 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 18, 2020 in the House:
- FN2: (H.FIN/DHS)
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 205
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 4/3/20
On May 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
On March 26, 2020 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 134
- PASSED Y29 N5 E4 A2
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: SB 134
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TARR
On March 25, 2020 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/26 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/25/2020
On March 24, 2020 in the House:
- FN2: (H.FIN/DHS)
- NR: MERRICK, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, TILTON
- DP: WOOL, JOSEPHSON, LEBON, KNOPP, JOHNSTON, FOSTER
- FIN RPT 6DP 3NR
On March 21, 2020 in the House:
- MOTION TO WAIVE FIN PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23(A)
- W/ SB 52, SB 55, SB 155, SB 172
- MOTION DIVIDE QUESTION W/O SB 172 (FLD) Y15 N17 E6 A2
- MOTION DIVIDE QUESTION W/O SB 52 (PSD) Y17 N15 E6 A2
- WAIVE FIN PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23(A) (FLD) Y22 N10 E6 A2
- MOTION TO WAIVE FIN PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23(A)
- W/ SB 55, SB 155, SB 172
- FIN WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23(A) (PSD) Y22 N9 E6 A3
- MOTION TO WAIVE RULE 23(A) WITHDRAWN
On March 20, 2020 in the House:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 134
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/19/2020
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y16 N- E4
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SB 134
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- FN1: (DHS)
- NR: STEDMAN, OLSON
- DP: VON IMHOF, HOFFMAN, WILSON, WIELECHOWSKI, BISHOP
- FIN RPT 5DP 2NR
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- FN1: (DHS)
- NR: SHOWER
- DP: WILSON, BEGICH, VON IMHOF, GIESSEL
- HSS RPT 4DP 1NR
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- HSS, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/10/20
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor