+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On August 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- 1:40 PM 5/22/09 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/25 CHAPTER 24 SLA 09
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/09
On April 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- V1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 18, 2009 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2009
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 133(FIN)
- PASSED Y40
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- HOLMES NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y40
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HERRON, GARDNER, LYNN, KAWASAKI, TUCK, CISSNA
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 133(FIN)
On April 17, 2009 in the House:
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 9DP 1NR
- DP: THOMAS, GARA, CRAWFORD, R.FOSTER, AUSTERMAN, KELLY, FAIRCLOUGH, JOULE,
- HAWKER
- NR: STOLTZE
- FN2: (DHS)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOULE, HOLMES
On April 16, 2009 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2009
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 133(FIN)
- COSPONSOR(S): THERRIAULT, WAGONER, DYSON, ELLIS
- PASSED Y19 N- V1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 133(FIN)
On April 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS 5DP 1NR SAME TITLE
- DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, HUGGINS, THOMAS, ELLIS
- NR: OLSON
- FN2: (DHS)
- COSPONSOR(S): FRENCH, KOOKESH, THOMAS, STEVENS, BUNDE, MEYER, HUGGINS, STEDMAN
On April 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): MENARD
On March 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- HSS RPT CS 3DP SAME TITLE
- DP: DAVIS, THOMAS, PASKVAN
- FN1: (DHS)
On March 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HSS, FIN
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor