+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On September 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/24/04
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/26 CHAPTER 168 SLA 04
- 3:19 PM 7/22/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- VERSION: CSSB 132(RES)
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TAKE UP RECONSIDERATION WITHDRAWN
On May 10, 2004 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2004
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 132(RES)
- PASSED Y38 E2
- MASEK NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN
On May 9, 2004 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- GUTTENBERG
- NR: DAHLSTROM, MASEK; AM: KERTTULA,
- DP: HEINZE, LYNN, STEPOVICH;
- RES RPT HCS(RES) 3DP 2NR 2AM
On May 6, 2004 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- DP: KOTT, WOLF, CISSNA, MORGAN
- CRA RPT 4DP
On May 4, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- CRA, RES
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KOOKESH, MORGAN
On May 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSSB 132(RES)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On May 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N-
- DAVIS, WAGONER
- HOFFMAN, COWDERY, FRENCH, ELLIS, ELTON,
- COSPONSOR(S): OLSON, WILKEN, GUESS,
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On May 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/1/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 132(RES)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- COWDERY NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- RES CS RECEIVED NEW TITLE
On April 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- WAGONER, SEEKINS, DYSON
- NR: OGAN; DP: LINCOLN, ELTON,
- RES RPT CS FORTHCOMING 5DP 1NR
On April 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- DP: STEDMAN, LINCOLN, WAGONER, ELTON
- CRA RPT CS 4DP NEW TITLE
On March 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- CRA, RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor