+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On October 5, 2022 in the House:
- FN1: (CED)
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 8/10/22
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 281
On May 14, 2022 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE
On May 9, 2022 in the House:
- REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
- FN1: (CED)
- AM: FIELDS, PRAX, KURKA, ZULKOSKY
- DP: SPOHNHOLZ
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 15
- HSS RPT HCS(HSS) NEW TITLE 1DP 4AM
On April 29, 2022 in the House:
- KAUFMAN, KURKA, MCCARTY
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TILTON, CARPENTER, GILLHAM, MCCABE, JOHNSON, CRONK, MCKAY,
On April 19, 2022 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): PRAX
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- HSS, L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, WILSON
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 132
- PASSED Y16 N- E3 A1
- VERSION: SB 132
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On March 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): HUGHES, REINBOLD, BISHOP, BEGICH, SHOWER, MYERS, MICCICHE
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/28 CAL
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/25/2022
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- FN1: (CED)
- DP: STEDMAN, BISHOP, HOFFMAN, WILSON, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON, VON IMHOF
- FIN RPT 7DP
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- NR: COSTELLO, REVAK
- L&C RPT 2NR 1DP
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C
- DP: GRAY-JACKSON
- FN1: (CED)
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- FN1: (CED)
- DP: WILSON, REINBOLD, BEGICH, HUGHES
- HSS RPT 4DP
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): GRAY-JACKSON
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- HSS, L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor