+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (64)
On October 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- 4:00 P.M. 7/22/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/30 CHAPTER 48 SLA 22
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 1/1/23
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- LIMIT ALL INTROS TO 3 MIN, DEBATE TO 2 MIN EACH Y36 N4
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS SB 131(FIN)
- PASSED Y29 N11
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 19
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS SB 131(FIN)
- RECEDE TAKEN UP UC
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- FAILED CONCUR (H) AM Y6 N14
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- FAILED RECEDE (H) AM Y17 N22 E1
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- CC RPT ADPTD Y19 N- A1 CCS SB 131
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- CC REPORT TAKEN UP
- CC RPT ADOPTED Y29 N9 A2 CCS SB 131
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- CC REPORT: CCS SB 131 RECEIVED
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- HOLLAND (CHAIR), MYERS, KAWASAKI
- CC REPORT READ
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- RECEDE MESSAGE RECEIVED
- JOSEPHSON (CHAIR), WOOL, CARPENTER
On May 17, 2022 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/2022
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN HCS ADOPTED Y27 N11 E1 A1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/18 CALENDAR
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND, TARR, JOSEPHSON
On May 16, 2022 in the House:
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) NEW TITLE 5DP 5NR
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 19
- DP: ORTIZ, THOMPSON, JOSEPHSON, RASMUSSEN, FOSTER
- NR: LEBON, CARPENTER, JOHNSON, WOOL, MERRICK
- FN4: ZERO(LWF)
- FN5: (ADM)
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- L&C RPT HCS(L&C) 6DP
- DP: SCHRAGE, MCCARTY, SNYDER, NELSON, FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ
- FN2: ZERO(LWF)
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TUCK
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/18/2021
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y17 N3
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 131(TITLE AM)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SB 131(TITLE AM)
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT 4DP
- DP: COSTELLO, MICCICHE, GRAY-JACKSON, STEVENS
- FN1: ZERO(LWF)
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- CRA RPT 2DP 2NR
- DP: HUGHES, GRAY-JACKSON
- NR: MYERS, WILSON
- FN1: ZERO(LWF)
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): GRAY-JACKSON
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- CRA, L&C
+ − Amendment
AM 1
AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y17 N3