+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (51)
On September 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/26/12
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 4/26/12
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 3:21 PM 5/16/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/28 CHAPTER 48 SLA 12
On April 30, 2012 in the House:
- FN2: (CED)
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 284
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 4/26/12
On April 12, 2012 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 130(FIN)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2012
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TUCK, MILLETT
- PASSED Y36 A3 V1
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 130(FIN)
On April 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N1
On April 10, 2012 in the House:
- FN2: (CED)
- FAIRCLOUGH
- DP: GARA, T.WILSON, GUTTENBERG, JOULE, NEUMAN, COSTELLO, EDGMON, DOOGAN,
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 9DP
On April 9, 2012 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG, GARA
On April 6, 2012 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOULE, DOOGAN, MUNOZ, AUSTERMAN
On April 5, 2012 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): EDGMON, KERTTULA, CISSNA, KAWASAKI, FOSTER, HERRON, DICK
On March 12, 2012 in the House:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- FN1: (GOV) (REMOVED)
- CORRECTED FIN RPT RECEIVED
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/6/2012
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 130(STA)
- PASSED Y17 N1 E2
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 130(STA)
- COSPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, PASKVAN, HOFFMAN, THOMAS
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- DP: HOFFMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, OLSON, ELLIS
- FIN RPT CS (STA) 5DP
- FN1: (GOV)
- FN2: (CED)
On February 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- FISCAL INFO FORTHCOMING
- FN1: (GOV)
- DP: WIELECHOWSKI, KOOKESH, PASKVAN, MEYER, GIESSEL
- STA RPT CS 5DP NEW TITLE
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- MEYER, STEVENS
- COSPONSOR(S): KOOKESH, MCGUIRE, STEDMAN, DAVIS, EGAN, ELLIS, MENARD, DYSON,
On April 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor