+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (49)
On September 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On August 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- 4:18 PM 8/5/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- SIGNED INTO LAW 8/6 CHAPTER 150 SLA 03
On May 19, 2003 in the House:
- BERKOWITZ NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/19/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 13(L&C)
- PASSED Y31 E2 A7
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
On May 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 19, 2003 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): CRAWFORD, OGG,
- KERTTULA, LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 13(L&C)
On May 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- A1
On May 19, 2003 in the House:
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y31 E2 A7
On May 18, 2003 in the House:
- DP: CRAWFORD; NR: LYNN, GUTTENBERG,
- L&C RPT HCS(L&C) 1DP 5NR
- DAHLSTROM, ROKEBERG, ANDERSON
- FN2: ZERO(CED)
On May 15, 2003 in the House:
- L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSSB 13(JUD)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 13(JUD)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2003
On May 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT CS 5DP NEW TITLE
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- DP: SEEKINS, ELLIS, FRENCH,
- OGAN, THERRIAULT
On May 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: STEVENS G
- AM: BUNDE; DP: FRENCH, SEEKINS;
- L&C RPT 2DP 1NR 1AM
On March 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): LINCOLN
On January 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): FRENCH
On January 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- L&C, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/10/03
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor