+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 19, 2014 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR PENDING REPORT
- IN FINANCE
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HUGHES
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- STA RPT HCS(STA) 4DP 1NR
- DP: GATTIS, KELLER, ISAACSON, LYNN
- NR: KREISS-TOMKINS
- FN2: (ADM)
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KELLER, GATTIS
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ISAACSON
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, FIN
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 127
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y5 N15
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- COSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, HUGGINS
- PASSED Y16 N4
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SB 127
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/12/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/14 CALENDAR
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 4DP
- DP: MEYER, FAIRCLOUGH, BISHOP, DUNLEAVY
- FN2: (ADM)
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 3DP 1DNP
- DP: DYSON, GIESSEL, COGHILL
- DNP: WIELECHOWSKI
- FN1: (ADM)
- STA RECOMMENDS ADDITIONAL FIN REFERRAL
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER STA
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA