+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSSB 125(CRA)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y19 N- V1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 125(CRA)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- CRA CS ADOPTED UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/21/2018
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS(CRA) 2DP 4NR
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: MACKINNON, VON IMHOF, OLSON, MICCICHE
- DP: BISHOP, STEVENS
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): OLSON
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: MACKINNON
- DP: BISHOP, GARDNER, STEDMAN, HOFFMAN
- CRA RPT CS 4DP 1NR NEW TITLE
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): BISHOP
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- CRA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/18