+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- FN10: (DHS/DFC)
- FN9: (AJS)
- FN8: (ADM)
- JUD CS RECEIVED NEW TITLE
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- NR: MYERS, HUGHES, SHOWER
- AM: HOLLAND, KIEHL
- JUD RPT CS FORTHCOMING 2AM 3NR
On April 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- HSS RPT CS 1DP 2AM NEW TITLE
- DP: WILSON
- AM: COSTELLO, HUGHES
- FN4: (DHS/DFC)
- FN5: (DHS/DOH)
- FN6: ZERO(DPS)
- FN7: (AJS)
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- JUD REFERRAL ADDED AFTER HSS
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
- FN2: (DHS)
- FN1: (DHS)
- HSS, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
SENATE RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor