+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (33)
On June 26, 1995 in the Senate:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/25 CHAPTER 42 SLA 95
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 7/1/95
On May 7, 1995 in the Senate:
- 3:20 PM 5/7/95 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 5, 1995 in the House:
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y31 N4 A5
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 124
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/05/95
On May 2, 1995 in the House:
- DP: BROWN, KELLY, THERRIAULT
- DP: HANLEY, MULDER, PARNELL, KOHRING
- FIN RPT 7DP 4NR
- NR: FOSTER, MARTIN, GRUSSENDORF
- NR: NAVARRE
- SENATE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DHSS) 4/12/95
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): BROWN
On April 28, 1995 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): BRICE
- FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 27, 1995 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/27/95
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 124
- PASSED Y17 N3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On April 25, 1995 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS ZERO FN (DHSS)
- FIN RPT 4DP 1DNP 2NR
On April 12, 1995 in the Senate:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DHSS)
- CRA RPT 3NR
On March 10, 1995 in the Senate:
- CRA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)