+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On June 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/10/01
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/9 CHAPTER 26 SLA 01
On May 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- 11:20 AM 5/2/01 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y16 N- A4
On April 25, 2001 in the House:
- VERSION: CSSB 121(RES) AM H
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 121(RES)
- PASSED Y38 E1 A1
On April 24, 2001 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/25 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/24/01
On April 21, 2001 in the House:
- DP: MCGUIRE, GREEN, FATE, STEVENS,
- RES RPT 7DP 2NR
- CHENAULT, MASEK, SCALZI; NR: KERTTULA,
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- KAPSNER
On April 19, 2001 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- DP: KOHRING, DYSON, CHENAULT, FATE
- O&G RPT 4DP
On April 11, 2001 in the House:
- O&G, RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/10/01
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y17 N3
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 121(RES)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 121(RES)
On April 9, 2001 in the Senate:
- FIN REFERRAL WAIVED REFERRED TO RULES
On April 3, 2001 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- DP: TORGERSON, TAYLOR, PEARCE, KELLY
- RES RPT CS 4DP SAME TITLE
On February 27, 2001 in the Senate:
- RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor