+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (50)
On September 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- 9:27 AM 6/21/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/26 CHAPTER 59 SLA 13
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/27/13
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/4/2013
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 12
- PASSED Y38 E2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: SB 12
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): CHENAULT, GARA, JOHNSON, LEDOUX, STOLTZE
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- FIN RPT 9DP 1NR 1AM
- DP: T.WILSON, HOLMES, MUNOZ, NEUMAN, THOMPSON, GARA, EDGMON, COSTELLO,
- AUSTERMAN
- NR: STOLTZE
- AM: KAWASAKI
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): FEIGE, COSTELLO, SADDLER
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): T.WILSON, HOLMES, KAWASAKI
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- STA RPT 7DP
- DP: KREISS-TOMKINS, GATTIS, KELLER, HUGHES, ISAACSON, MILLETT, LYNN
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HUGHES, MILLETT, ISAACSON, KELLER
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GATTIS
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, FIN
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 12
- COSPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, GARDNER, BISHOP, EGAN, DUNLEAVY, STEVENS,
- WIELECHOWSKI
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SB 12
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/25/2013
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/27 CALENDAR
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 6DP 1NR
- DP: MEYER, KELLY, HOFFMAN, BISHOP, DUNLEAVY, FAIRCLOUGH
- NR: OLSON
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 3DP 1NR
- DP: DYSON, COGHILL, GIESSEL
- NR: WIELECHOWSKI
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/11/13
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, FIN
- COSPONSOR(S): GIESSEL, MCGUIRE, HUGGINS, KELLY, DYSON, MEYER
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor