+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (42)
On September 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 12/13/21
- SIGNED INTO LAW 9/14 CHAPTER 34 SLA 21
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2:58 P.M. 8/27/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 12
- LIMIT ALL DEBATE TO 2 MIN EACH Y23 N16 E1
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/19/2021
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y37 N1 A2
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: SB 12
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): STORY, JOHNSON, HOPKINS, SCHRAGE, TARR, SPOHNHOLZ, RAUSCHER,
- JOSEPHSON, NELSON
On May 15, 2021 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- DP: KAUFMAN, SCHRAGE, MCCARTY, SNYDER, FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ
- L&C RPT 6DP
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- DP: NELSON, STORY, RAUSCHER, SHAW, TARR, TUCK
- MLV RPT 6DP
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- MLV REPLACES STA REFERRAL
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, L&C
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TUCK
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- HUGHES, REINBOLD, STEDMAN, BISHOP, MICCICHE
- COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, REVAK, HOLLAND, STEVENS, GRAY-JACKSON, WIELECHOWSKI,
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 12
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/3/2021
- VERSION: SB 12
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT 3DP
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- DP: COSTELLO, REVAK, GRAY-JACKSON
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: HOLLAND
- DP: SHOWER, KAWASAKI, COSTELLO
- STA RPT 3DP 1NR
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- STA, L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor