+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (69)
On July 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/06
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/16 CHAPTER 72 SLA 06
On June 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- 3:17 PM 6/6/06 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 4, 2006 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 43
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
On May 3, 2006 in the House:
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 12(STA) AM H(EFD ADD H)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GRUENBERG
- PASSED Y34 E1 A5
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- NEW AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 WITHDRAWN
- BEFORE THE HOUSE
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 2, 2006 in the House:
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 12(STA)
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- AM NO 1 OFFERED AND PENDING
- HELD TO 5/3 CALENDAR
On May 1, 2006 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): OLSON, KERTTULA
- HELD TO 5/2 CALENDAR
On April 29, 2006 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM, GARDNER
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/1 CALENDAR
- STA HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/29/2006
On April 25, 2006 in the House:
- FN4: ZERO(LEG)
- FN3: ZERO(ADM)
- AM: GARA
- DP: COGHILL, KOTT, WILSON, GRUENBERG, MCGUIRE;
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 43
- JUD RPT HCS(STA) NT 5DP 1AM
On April 24, 2006 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, GARA
On April 12, 2006 in the House:
- FN4: ZERO(LEG)
- DP: LYNN, GATTO, GRUENBERG, ELKINS, RAMRAS, SEATON
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 43
- STA RPT HCS(STA) NT 6DP
- FN3: ZERO(ADM)
On April 11, 2006 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): RAMRAS
On February 17, 2006 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN
On May 3, 2005 in the House:
- STA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 12(STA)
- VERSION: CSSB 12(STA)
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On May 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/2 CALENDAR
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/1/2005
On April 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- DP: SEEKINS, FRENCH, THERRIAULT, HUGGINS
- JUD RPT CS(STA) 4DP 1NR
- FN2: ZERO(LEG)
- NR: GUESS
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
On April 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- STA CS RECEIVED NEW TITLE
On April 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(LEG)
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- DP: THERRIAULT, HUGGINS, DAVIS, ELTON
- STA RPT CS FORTHCOMING 4DP
On February 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): THERRIAULT, ELLIS, WILKEN
On January 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- OLSON, STEDMAN, STEVENS B, COWDERY
- COSPONSOR(S): BUNDE, SEEKINS, WAGONER, ELTON, KOOKESH, HUGGINS, STEVENS G,
On January 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): FRENCH
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- STA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 12/30/04
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor