+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- GRAY-JACKSON, HOFFMAN, VON IMHOF, BISHOP, STEDMAN, WIELECHOWSKI
- COSPONSOR(S): SHOWER, COGHILL, KAWASAKI, COSTELLO, STEVENS, REINBOLD
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- JUD RPT CS 4DP 1AM NEW TITLE
- AM: REINBOLD
- DP: HUGHES, MICCICHE, SHOWER, KIEHL
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN3: ZERO(DHS)
- FN4: ZERO(LAW)
- FN5: ZERO(AJS)
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- JUD WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- JUD, FIN
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED-REFERRALS
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): HUGHES
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/19
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor