+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO RULES
- FN4: ZERO(DHS/DOH)
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
- FN2: ZERO(REV)
- AM: KAWASAKI, HOLLAND
- DP: SHOWER, REINBOLD
- STA RPT CS 2DP 2AM SAME TITLE
- FN5: ZERO(EED)
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- NR: KIEHL
- DP: HOLLAND, HUGHES, SHOWER
- JUD RPT CS 3DP 1NR NEW TITLE
- FN2: ZERO(REV)
- FN4: ZERO(DHS)
- FN5: ZERO(EED)
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): MYERS
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- DP: HUGHES
- CRA RPT 1DP 1DNP 2NR
- DNP: GRAY-JACKSON
- NR: MYERS, WILSON
- FN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- CRA REFERRAL ADDED AFTER EDC
- FIN REFERRAL REMOVED
- FN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
- NR: BEGICH
- DP: HOLLAND, HUGHES, STEVENS, MICCICHE
- EDC RPT CS 4DP 1NR SAME TITLE
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- EDC, JUD, STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor