+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (71)
On September 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 9:20 AM 5/23 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On September 19, 2014 in the House:
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 119(FIN) AM H
- ENGROSSED & SENT TO SENATE 4/30
On September 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/28 CHAPTER 18 SLA 14
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- SESSION CANCELED 4/24 - ON 4/25 CALENDAR
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 119(FIN) AM H
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AMS 10 & 11 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 10 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 11 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y38 E2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CBRF SECTION(S) ADOPTED Y38 E2
- ENGROSSMENT WAIVED, RULE 43(B)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 119(FIN) AM H
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y18 N1 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CBRF SECTION(S) ADOPTED Y19 N- E1
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- HELD TO 4/24 CALENDAR
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP 4/22 - ON 4/23 CALENDAR
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y12 N27 A1
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED Y24 N12 A4
- AM NO 3 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 5 FAILED Y6 N28 A6
- AM NO 9 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/22 CALENDAR
- AM NO 6 FAILED Y11 N27 A2
- AM NO 8 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 7 NOT OFFERED
- BEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING
On April 20, 2014 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR PENDING REPORT
- IN FINANCE
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) NT 5DP 2NR 4AM
- TECHNICAL TITLE CHANGE
- DP: THOMPSON, MUNOZ, T.WILSON, STOLTZE, AUSTERMAN
- AM: GUTTENBERG, HOLMES, GARA, COSTELLO
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/20/2014
- NOT TAKEN UP 4/20 - ON 4/21 CALENDAR
- NR: NEUMAN, EDGMON
On April 19, 2014 in the House:
- IN FINANCE
- RULES TO CALENDAR PENDING REPORT
On April 13, 2014 in the House:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- VERSION: CSSB 119(FIN) AM
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y19 N1
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y5 N15
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMDS UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 119(FIN)
- FRENCH NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- DP: KELLY, MEYER, OLSON, HOFFMAN, FAIRCLOUGH, DUNLEAVY
- FIN RPT CS 6DP NEW TITLE
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/11 CALENDAR
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/9/14
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (13)
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor